This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2021 at 18:16:42 (UTC).

ANDRES GOMEZ, ET AL. VS STK WESTWOOD, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 ANDRES GOMEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STK WESTWOOD, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4226

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOMEZ ANDRES

THE ONE GROUP LLC

Defendants and Plaintiffs

THE ONE GROUP LLC

STK WESTWOOD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY GREG

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/2/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/2/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/14/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Gregory F. Hurley in Support of Defendants STK Westwood, LLC and The One Group, LLC's Demurrer

7/14/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Gregory F. Hurley in Support of Defendants STK Westwood, LLC and The One Group, LLC's Demurrer

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/21/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearlng Date of Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff Andres Gomez' Complaint

7/27/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearlng Date of Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff Andres Gomez' Complaint

Reply (name extension) - Reply in Support of Demurrer

8/4/2021: Reply (name extension) - Reply in Support of Demurrer

Order (name extension) - Order [proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date of Defendants Demurrer to Plaintiff Andres Gomez Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay

8/10/2021: Order (name extension) - Order [proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date of Defendants Demurrer to Plaintiff Andres Gomez Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

9/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/15/2021

9/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/15/2021

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/30/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Andres Gomez, et al. on 06/02/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Andres Gomez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendants STK Westwood, LLC and The One Group, LLC's Notice of Demurrer and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/17/2021; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOrder [proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date of Defendants Demurrer to Plaintiff Andres Gomez Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay; Signed and Filed by: STK Westwood, LLC (Defendant); As to: Andres Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: The One Group, LLC (Plaintiff); STK Westwood, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Andres Gomez (Plaintiff); The One Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: STK Westwood, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andres Gomez (Plaintiff); The One Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: STK Westwood, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andres Gomez (Plaintiff); The One Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: STK Westwood, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STK WESTWOOD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The One Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY GREG