This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 01:06:03 (UTC).

ANDREA LIU VS J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 ANDREA LIU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J K RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0450

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIU ANDREA

Defendant

J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/7/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

4/7/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/7/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/13/2021

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/13/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Andrea Liu on 04/07/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2021 at 03:00 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/13/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Andrea Liu (Plaintiff); As to: J.K. Residential Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2021 at 03:00 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant