This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 12:10:03 (UTC).

ANA TELLEZ VS OPORTUN, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 ANA TELLEZ filed an Other lawsuit against OPORTUN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0713

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELLEZ ANA

Defendant

OPORTUN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENTHAL MATTHEW A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAddress for Matthew A Rosenthal (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ana Tellez on 01/26/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ana Tellez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ana Tellez (Plaintiff); As to: Oportun, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ana Tellez (Plaintiff); As to: Oportun, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ana Tellez (Plaintiff); As to: Oportun, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL MATTHEW A