This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 01:08:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY, INC. VS JPS MOTORSPORTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JPS MOTORSPORTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1869

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY INC.

Defendant

JPS MOTORSPORTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ANNA LAURA M.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/6/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/6/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

4/6/2022: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4/6/2022: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/6/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

4/6/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to JPS Motorsports, Inc. On the Complaint filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. on 12/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. against Defendant JPS Motorsports, Inc. on the Complaint filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. on 12/08/2021 for the principal amount of $20,000.00 and costs of $597.00 for a total of $20,597.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. on 12/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., does 1 - 5 inclusive only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/25/2022; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: JPS Motorsports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPS Motorsports, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Travel Related Svcs Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ANNA LAURA M.