This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 17:53:18 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS ZHIMING WU

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZHIMING WU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0430

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

WU ZHIMING AKA ZHI MING WU AN INDIVIDUAL

Diamond Bar, CA 91765-3668

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/6/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/27/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ZHIMING WU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to ZHIMING WU; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 01/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ZHIMING WU (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/13/2022; Service Cost: 113.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ZHIMING WU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ZHIMING WU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ZHIMING WU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M