This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 15:21:21 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS WAJIHA SIDDIQUI

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAJIHA SIDDIQUI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1609

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

SIDDIQUI WAJIHA AKA WAJIHA RIAZ SIDDIQUI AKA WOJIHA R SIDDIQUI AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/20/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/20/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/20/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/1/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: WAJIHA SIDDIQUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: WAJIHA SIDDIQUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: WAJIHA SIDDIQUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: WAJIHA SIDDIQUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: WAJIHA SIDDIQUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M