This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2023 at 15:01:31 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS RAMEZ ROMAN

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMEZ ROMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0812

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ROMAN RAMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROHAN RALUCA

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/12/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/12/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE DILIGENCE

2/22/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE DILIGENCE

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE DILIGENCE

2/22/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE DILIGENCE

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/23/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by American Express National Bank on 01/12/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by American Express National Bank as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ramez Roman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDeclaration RE DILIGENCE; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDeclaration RE DILIGENCE; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ramez Roman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ramez Roman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ramez Roman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less