Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 10:38:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS PING LIU

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PING LIU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1730

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

LIU PING AKA PING S LIU AKA SONIA P LIU AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/25/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/25/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • Hearing04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: PING LIU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: PING LIU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: PING LIU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: PING LIU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M