*******0636
01/11/2023
Other
Contract - Debt Collection
Los Angeles, California
NICHOLAS F. DAUM
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK
OWENS MICHAEL AKA MICHAEL L OWENS
ROHAN RALUCA
1/11/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint
1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
1/11/2023: Complaint - Complaint
1/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
1/11/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
2/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
2/21/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 01/11/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL OWENS (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/21/2023
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL OWENS (Defendant); Service Date: 01/15/2023; Service Cost: 68.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL OWENS (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL OWENS (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL OWENS (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse
[-] Read Less