This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 15:26:13 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS MARTHA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTHA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2835

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

GARCIA MARTHA AKA MARTHA V GARCIA AKA MARTHA VERONICA GARCIA AN INDIVIDUAL

Long Beach, CA 90802-1168

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEITH KAMBRIE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/1/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

2/1/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/1/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/1/2023: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2025
  • Hearing04/16/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: MARTHA GARCIA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/16/2025 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARTHA GARCIA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/08/2023; Service Cost: 118.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARTHA GARCIA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARTHA GARCIA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARTHA GARCIA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less