This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 20:44:53 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS JEONG HYUN CHO

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEONG HYUN CHO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1781

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

CHO JEONG HYUN AKA JEONG CHO AKA JEONG H CHO AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/23/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/23/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

12/8/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/11/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 11/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: JEONG HYUN CHO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: JEONG HYUN CHO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: JEONG HYUN CHO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: JEONG HYUN CHO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M