This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 11:08:34 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS HAFSA IQBAL, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAFSA IQBAL, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2542

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

IQBAL AN INDIVIDUAL HAFSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESQ. KAMBRIE KEITH

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/1/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/1/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HAFSA IQBAL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HAFSA IQBAL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HAFSA IQBAL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HAFSA IQBAL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less