This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 05:48:35 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS GEORGE PARONYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEORGE PARONYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1406

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

PARONYAN AN INDIVIDUAL GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

1/25/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/10/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 01/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: GEORGE PARONYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: GEORGE PARONYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: GEORGE PARONYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: GEORGE PARONYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bernie C. LaForteza in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M