This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 22:08:10 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS FERNANDO CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FERNANDO CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0813

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

CHAVEZ FERNANDO AKA FERNANDO S CHAVEZ AN INDIVIDUAL JR

Canoga Park, CA 91304-3987

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO CHAVEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/08/2021; Service Cost: 113.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO CHAVEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO CHAVEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO CHAVEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M