This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 11:56:13 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS DENA C SPECKMAN

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DENA C SPECKMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1375

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

SPECKMAN DENA C AKA DENA SPECKMAN AKA DENA CATHLEEN SPECKMAN AKA DENA C WARD AN INDIVIDUAL

Malibu, CA 90265-4141

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

1/27/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/8/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by American Express National Bank on 01/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by American Express National Bank as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: DENA C SPECKMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: DENA C SPECKMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: DENA C SPECKMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Express National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: DENA C SPECKMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M