This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2022 at 21:43:06 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS ANN A GRIGORYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANN A GRIGORYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0482

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

GRIGORYAN ANN A AKA ANN GRIGORYAN AKA ANN AYKANUSH GRIGORYAN AN INDIVIDUAL

Glendale, CA 91202-1661

AR REALTY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/7/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/7/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/7/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/11/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/10/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/15/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration crc 3.1800

3/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration crc 3.1800

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration ccp 1033

3/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration ccp 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/15/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration ccp 1033; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANN A GRIGORYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration crc 3.1800; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket; Default not entered as to ANN A GRIGORYAN; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 01/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 01/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, does 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: AR REALTY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANN A GRIGORYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/05/2022; Service Cost: 113.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: AR REALTY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/19/2022; Service Cost: 113.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANN A GRIGORYAN (Defendant); AR REALTY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANN A GRIGORYAN (Defendant); AR REALTY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ANN A GRIGORYAN (Defendant); AR REALTY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M