This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 12:55:54 (UTC).

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS VIVIAN THOMAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIVIAN THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8198

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

THOMAS VIVIAN

CLEAN ENERGY STORAGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRAY MICHAEL K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/15/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/15/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/15/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/28/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

12/23/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Stipulated Judgment - Stipulated Judgment

12/22/2021: Stipulated Judgment - Stipulated Judgment

Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment

12/22/2021: Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation against Defendant VIVIAN THOMAS and Defendant CLEAN ENERGY STORAGE, INC., a California corporation on the Complaint filed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation on 11/15/2021 for the principal amount of $13,547.57 for a total of $13,547.57.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulated Judgment: Filed By: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation for Judgment: Filed By: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: VIVIAN THOMAS (Defendant); CLEAN ENERGY STORAGE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: VIVIAN THOMAS (Defendant); CLEAN ENERGY STORAGE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: VIVIAN THOMAS (Defendant); CLEAN ENERGY STORAGE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN ENERGY STORAGE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURRAY, MICHAEL K