This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 21:07:31 (UTC).

AMBER M. ORTIZ VS HI-TEK SMOG CHECK & AUTO REPAIR

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 AMBER M ORTIZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HI-TEK SMOG CHECK AUTO REPAIR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7040

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ AMBER M.

Defendant

HI-TEK SMOG CHECK & AUTO REPAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHBAZ JACOB A.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/28/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/27/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/27/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

9/27/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/27/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/27/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Amber M. Ortiz on 09/27/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Amber M. Ortiz as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Amber M. Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Amber M. Ortiz (Plaintiff); As to: Hi-Tek Smog Check & Auto Repair (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Amber M. Ortiz (Plaintiff); As to: Hi-Tek Smog Check & Auto Repair (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Amber M. Ortiz (Plaintiff); As to: Hi-Tek Smog Check & Auto Repair (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Amber M. Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAHBAZ JACOB A