Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 00:39:44 (UTC).

ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION VS JUAN MENDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUAN MENDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3028

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY BANK A CORPORATION

Defendant

MENDEZ AN INDIVIDUAL JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURSTEIN ARDEN D.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

5/13/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

5/13/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/13/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Complaint - Complaint

4/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2024
  • Hearing04/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Hearing09/09/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Mendez, an individual (Defendant); Service Date: 05/28/2021; Service Cost: 113.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030); Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Mendez, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Mendez, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Mendez, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURSTEIN ARDEN D.