This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 18:57:39 (UTC).

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF YOLANDA CARR VS JARELL MANNING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF YOLANDA CARR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JARELL MANNING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8221

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF YOLANDA CARR

Defendants

MANNING JARELL

DIXON DONEISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACHEN BETTY C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2024
  • Hearing11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company as subrogee of Yolanda Carr (Plaintiff); As to: Jarell Manning (Defendant); Doneisha Dixon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company as subrogee of Yolanda Carr (Plaintiff); As to: Jarell Manning (Defendant); Doneisha Dixon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company as subrogee of Yolanda Carr (Plaintiff); As to: Jarell Manning (Defendant); Doneisha Dixon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF JOSE GUTIERREZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACHEN BETTY C.