This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2021 at 10:26:37 (UTC).

ALEXANDRO ORDONEZ VS FORZA MOTORS, INC,.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 ALEXANDRO ORDONEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FORZA MOTORS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0814

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORDONEZ ALEXANDRO

Defendant

FORZA MOTORS INC .

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DAHL NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

4/20/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/21/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

4/2/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

3/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

Complaint - Complaint

1/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/29/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alexandro Ordonez on 01/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alexandro Ordonez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 04/20/2021 to 04/20/2021; As To Parties: Forza Motors, Inc,. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Alexandro Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Alexandro Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexandro Ordonez (Plaintiff); As to: Forza Motors, Inc,. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexandro Ordonez (Plaintiff); As to: Forza Motors, Inc,. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alexandro Ordonez (Plaintiff); As to: Forza Motors, Inc,. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORZA MOTORS INC . is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAHL NICHOLAS