This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2022 at 22:07:33 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1721

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER LLC DBA ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

ARAGON MD DRPH DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH TOMAS J.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIEPEN SCOTT J.

STOCK STANTON J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KAU NICOLE

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

3/15/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

3/15/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

3/15/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/28/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/28/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

General Denial - General Denial

4/26/2022: General Denial - General Denial

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2025
  • Hearing03/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARAGON MD DRPH DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH TOMAS J is a litigant

Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA CARE CENTER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAU NICOLE