This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 10:45:45 (UTC).

ALEX SHABUN VS BEVERLY HILLS BMW, INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 ALEX SHABUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS BMW, INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0163

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHABUN ALEX

Defendant

BEVERLY HILLS BMW INCORPORATED

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/13/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/13/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/13/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/14/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/17/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/11/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/11/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Brent Kutz

3/11/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Brent Kutz

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Alex Shabun against Defendant Beverly Hills BMW, Incorporated on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Alex Shabun on 01/13/2022 for the principal amount of $4,600.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $4,690.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Beverly Hills BMW, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 03/11/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Alex Shabun (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Hills BMW, Incorporated (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Brent Kutz; Filed by: Beverly Hills BMW, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Alex Shabun (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Hills BMW, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant