This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2021 at 01:16:22 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO MIGUEL CHAVANA, ET AL. VS SHERMAN DALE ROURMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 ALEJANDRO MIGUEL CHAVANA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHERMAN DALE ROURMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3538

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAVANA ALEJANDRO MIGUEL

ROJAS VELEZ JOSE BENITO

Defendants

ROURMAN SHERMAN DALE DBA VEHICLE CENTER

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN SAFETY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/6/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/6/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/6/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/8/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

7/6/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/14/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2024
  • Hearing05/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Hearing11/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection - Pleadings: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN SAFETY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 07/21/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant); As to: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant); As to: Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant); As to: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alejandro Miguel Chavana, et al. on 05/06/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Alejandro Miguel Chavana and Jose Benito Rojas Velez as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); As to: Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/20/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); As to: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant); Service Date: 05/20/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); As to: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant); Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); As to: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant); Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alejandro Miguel Chavana (Plaintiff); Jose Benito Rojas Velez (Plaintiff); As to: Sherman Dale Rourman (Defendant); Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA