This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2022 at 13:19:05 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO DIAZ VS H.F.C., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 ALEJANDRO DIAZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against H F C , INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4197

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ ALEJANDRO

Defendants

H.F.C. INC.

HAGERMAN DAVID H.

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

6/22/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/22/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

6/22/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/22/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint - Complaint

6/22/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

6/22/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/25/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alejandro Diaz on 06/22/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alejandro Diaz as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff); As to: H.F.C., Inc. (Defendant); David H. Hagerman (Defendant); Universal Studios LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff); As to: H.F.C., Inc. (Defendant); David H. Hagerman (Defendant); Universal Studios LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff); As to: H.F.C., Inc. (Defendant); David H. Hagerman (Defendant); Universal Studios LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HFC Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLC. is a litigant