This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2022 at 20:05:40 (UTC).

AIR AL, INC. VS SHANE HENEGHAN

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 AIR AL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHANE HENEGHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1878

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIR AL INC.

Defendant

HENEGHAN SHANE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

11/24/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

11/24/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/24/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/20/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/28/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/27/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/27/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/27/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Jacob Chai

1/27/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Jacob Chai

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/28/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/30/2022 ; Status Date changed from 01/27/2022 to 03/30/2022 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Air Al, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shane Heneghan (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/27/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2022 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 01/27/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Air Al, Inc. against Defendant Shane Heneghan on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Air Al, Inc. on 11/24/2021 for the principal amount of $3,600.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $3,690.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Jacob Chai; Filed by: Air Al, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Air Al, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shane Heneghan (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Air Al, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shane Heneghan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2022 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIR AL INC C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU CE is a litigant