This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 10:52:50 (UTC).

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4134

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC

Defendants

KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/2/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

11/2/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

11/2/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

12/29/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2021

12/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/25/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/11/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/11/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/11/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc against Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc on 11/02/2021 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,590.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAddress for Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company (Defendant) court order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kaiser Health Care Plan Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company to Kaiser Health Care Plan Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Kaiser Health Care Plan Inc. to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket** Case Name changed from ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC vs KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY to ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC vs KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket** Case Name changed from ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC vs KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC to ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC vs KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 03/11/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2021 at 03:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 03/11/2022 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection : document(s) rec'd by Fax: SC-104 Proof of Service: Name Extension: : document(s) rec'd by Fax: SC-104 Proof of Service; As To Parties changed from Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc (Plaintiff) to Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/29/2021 at 03:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant