This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 02:26:54 (UTC).

ADLI LAW GROUP, P.C., A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION VS N&F GRANITE AND FINE FLOORING, LLC, A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 ADLI LAW GROUP, P C , A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against N F GRANITE AND FINE FLOORING, LLC, A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3799

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADLI LAW GROUP P.C. A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Defendants

DASILVA FRANCISCO

N&F GRANITE AND FINE FLOORING LLC A LOUISIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERKE MICHAEL N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/17/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/17/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ADLI Law Group, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff); As to: N&F Granite and Fine Flooring, LLC, a Louisiana limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/09/2021; Service Cost: 209.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ADLI Law Group, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff); As to: N&F Granite and Fine Flooring, LLC, a Louisiana limited liability company (Defendant); Francisco Dasilva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ADLI Law Group, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff); As to: N&F Granite and Fine Flooring, LLC, a Louisiana limited liability company (Defendant); Francisco Dasilva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ADLI Law Group, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff); As to: N&F Granite and Fine Flooring, LLC, a Louisiana limited liability company (Defendant); Francisco Dasilva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADLI LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKE MICHAEL N