This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 18:49:56 (UTC).

ADDISON BAILEY, ET AL. VS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 ADDISON BAILEY, filed an Other lawsuit against CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2927

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES

BAILEY ADDISON

BAILEY ERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VAN ALLEN BRIAN SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/4/2022: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/4/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/4/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Petition (name extension) - Petition to Enforce Access to Medical Records Under Evidence Code Section 1158 and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs in the Amount of $2,050.00 or According to Proof

8/4/2022: Petition (name extension) - Petition to Enforce Access to Medical Records Under Evidence Code Section 1158 and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs in the Amount of $2,050.00 or According to Proof

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/4/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Addison

8/15/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Addison

Summons - Summons on Petition

8/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Petition

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/30/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by Addison Bailey, et al. on 08/04/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Children's Hospital of Los Angeles, Addison Bailey, and Erica Bailey as to Children's Hospital of Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Addison Bailey (Petitioner); Erica Bailey (Petitioner); As to: Children's Hospital of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAddress for Brian Scott Van Allen (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Enforce Access to Medical Records Under Evidence Code Section 1158 and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs in the Amount of $2,050.00 or According to Proof scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Addison Bailey (Petitioner); As to: Children's Hospital of Los Angeles (Respondent); Service Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 165.43; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Addison Bailey (Petitioner); As to: Children's Hospital of Los Angeles (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/06/2022; Service Cost: 146.42; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Addison Bailey (Petitioner); Erica Bailey (Petitioner); As to: Children's Hospital of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Addison; Signed and Filed by: Erica Bailey (Petitioner); As to: Addison Bailey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Addison: Filed By: Erica Bailey (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Brian Scott Van Allen (Attorney): First Name changed from BRIAN to Brian; Last Name changed from ALLEN to Van Allen; Organization Name changed from BELGUM, FRY & VAN ALLEN LLP to Belgum, Fry & Van Allen; Middle Name changed from VAN to Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Enforce Access to Medical Records Under Evidence Code Section 1158 and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs in the Amount of $2,050.00 or According to Proof scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPetition to Enforce Access to Medical Records Under Evidence Code Section 1158 and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs in the Amount of $2,050.00 or According to Proof; Filed by: Addison Bailey (Petitioner); Erica Bailey (Petitioner); As to: Children's Hospital of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Addison Bailey (Petitioner); Erica Bailey (Petitioner); As to: Children's Hospital of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN ALLEN BRIAN SCOTT