Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 11:31:26 (UTC).

ADANIEL THOMPSON VS PS REALTY HOLDING GROUP

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ADANIEL THOMPSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PS REALTY HOLDING GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0070

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON ADANIEL

Defendant

PS REALTY HOLDING GROUP

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/21/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Adaniel Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: PS Realty Holding Group (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/08/21; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Adaniel Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: PS Realty Holding Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less