This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 23:09:18 (UTC).

ADAM ROBERTS VS ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 ADAM ROBERTS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY CHEUNG MARINO and MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0667

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY CHEUNG MARINO

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTS ADAM

Defendant

ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

6/6/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/6/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/6/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/20/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Adam Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 2 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 07/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Adam Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Adam Roberts on 06/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Adam Roberts as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Adam Roberts on 06/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Adam Roberts as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Adam Roberts (Plaintiff); As to: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Adam Roberts (Plaintiff); As to: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 07/20/2022 01:30 PM at Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketThis case is assigned to Judge Jenny Cheung Marino in Department 2 at Bellflower Courthouse for trial purposes only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Defendant) to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Defendant) to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Adam Roberts (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Michael Pearce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant