This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2022 at 06:11:31 (UTC).

ADAM CARDON VS AT&T MOBILITY LLC

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 ADAM CARDON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AT T MOBILITY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1965

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARDON ADAM

Defendant

AT&T MOBILITY LLC DBA AT&T WIRELESS

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/19/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/19/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/19/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/18/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Adam Cardon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Adam Cardon on 05/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Adam Cardon as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Adam Cardon (Plaintiff); As to: AT&T Mobility LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant