This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 01:49:05 (UTC).

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC VS MICHAEL EUGENE REZNICK

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL EUGENE REZNICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1964

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC

Defendant

REZNICK MICHAEL EUGENE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/23/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/23/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/23/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/24/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/20/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/18/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/18/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/18/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ace Attorney Service, Inc against Defendant Michael Eugene Reznick on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ace Attorney Service, Inc on 05/23/2022 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $2,550.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 07/18/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Ace Attorney Service, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/18/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ace Attorney Service, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Eugene Reznick (Defendant); Service Cost: 175.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ace Attorney Service, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Eugene Reznick (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant