This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2023 at 08:03:05 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS VS BRIANA G DECKER

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIANA G DECKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0934

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LCC

Defendant

DECKER BRIANA G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE FLINT C

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/12/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/12/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/8/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Absolute Resolutions on 01/12/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LCC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Absolute Resolutions Investments, LCC (Plaintiff); As to: BRIANA G DECKER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Absolute Resolutions Investments, LCC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Absolute Resolutions to Absolute Resolutions Investments, LCC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Absolute Resolutions (Plaintiff); As to: BRIANA G DECKER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Absolute Resolutions (Plaintiff); As to: BRIANA G DECKER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Absolute Resolutions (Plaintiff); As to: BRIANA G DECKER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less