This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 01:33:41 (UTC).

ABDEL BENGELOUNE VS CACH, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 ABDEL BENGELOUNE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CACH, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3534

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENGELOUNE ABDEL

Defendants

CACH LLC

RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L.P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/8/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/8/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

9/8/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/12/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/17/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Postponement, Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Postponement, Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/20/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

10/20/2022: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/1/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 01:30 PM in Department 90 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Cach, LLC (Defendant) to Cach, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 12/14/2022 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Postponement, Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cach, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Filed By: Cach, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/20/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Cach, LLC (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Abdel Bengeloune (Plaintiff); As to: Cach, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Abdel Bengeloune (Plaintiff); As to: Cach, LLC (Defendant); Resurgent Capital Services L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant