This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2023 at 21:02:25 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP. VS VICTORIA K Y POWELL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTORIA K Y POWELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1047

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

POWELL VICTORIA K Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEWPORT STEPHANIE A

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

1/13/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/13/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: A-L Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Victoria K Y Powell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: A-L Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Victoria K Y Powell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: A-L Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Victoria K Y Powell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less