This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2023 at 08:21:30 (UTC).

3XAL, LLC VS HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 3XAL, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0485

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3XAL LLC

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

THE HOME DEPOT INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/30/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/30/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/30/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

3/23/2023: Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by 3XAL, LLC on 01/30/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by 3XAL, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketSmall Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR); Filed by: 3XAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Defendant); THE HOME DEPOT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: 3XAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Defendant); THE HOME DEPOT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less