This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/13/2023 at 07:42:30 (UTC).

3XAL, LLC VS HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 3XAL, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0485

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3XAL LLC

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

THE HOME DEPOT INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/30/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/30/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/30/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 1A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: 3XAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Defendant); THE HOME DEPOT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less