This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2023 at 14:51:40 (UTC).

26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP VS DORA ARVIZU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2023 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DORA ARVIZU,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1006

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

26502 RUETHER AVENUE LP

Defendants

ARVIZU DORA

PINO DIOSLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER STEPHEN C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

2/8/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

2/8/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/8/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

2/8/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

2/8/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/28/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/29/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/29/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Application (name extension) - Application APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

3/29/2023: Application (name extension) - Application APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

3/29/2023: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/29/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4/17/2023: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Default Judgment

4/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Default Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP against Defendant DORA ARVIZU and Defendant DIOSLEY PINO on the Complaint filed by 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP on 02/08/2023 for damages of $18,378.00, attorney fees of $941.34, interest of $1,837.80, and costs of $635.00 for a total of $21,792.14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff); As to: DORA ARVIZU (Defendant); DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from DORA ARVIZU (Defendant), DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant) to DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant), DORA ARVIZU (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Default Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/11/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff); As to: DORA ARVIZU (Defendant); DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketApplication APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT; Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff); As to: DORA ARVIZU (Defendant); DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff); As to: DORA ARVIZU (Defendant); DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff); As to: DORA ARVIZU (Defendant); DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 26502 RUETHER AVENUE, LP (Plaintiff); As to: DORA ARVIZU (Defendant); DIOSLEY PINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/11/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less