This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 23:35:39 (UTC).

21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6841

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESTEPHAN ANA F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/21/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/21/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/21/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/21/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/21/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2024
  • Hearing09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION; On the Complaint filed by 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY on 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 09/29/2021; Service Cost: 101.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where 21st Century Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESTEPHAN, ANN F.