This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 01:55:41 (UTC).

1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC VS JOHN DOE

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOHN DOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6336

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX LLC

Defendant

DOE JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

10/27/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

11/12/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Unlawful Detainer Hub)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Unlawful Detainer Hub)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Unlawful Detainer Hub) of 10/21/2021

10/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to the Unlawful Detainer Hub) of 10/21/2021

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

10/27/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff

10/5/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff

Witness List - Witness List

10/5/2021: Witness List - Witness List

Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment

9/27/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

9/16/2021: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/7/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

9/7/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/31/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 97 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAddress for Solomon Yenesu Erroneously Sued As JOHN DOE (Defendant) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAddress for Solomon Yenesu Erroneously Sued As JOHN DOE (Defendant) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE; Filed by: 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Solomon Yenesu Erroneously Sued As JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Solomon Yenesu Erroneously Sued As JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Solomon Yenesu Erroneously Sued As JOHN DOE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/03/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Solomon Yenesu Erroneously Sued As JOHN DOE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/03/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 97 - Hon. Gail Killefer; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 1025 SOUTH FAIRFAX, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN DOE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A