This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:30:57 (UTC).

ZAGHI, KERMAT VS. LOPEZ, JORGE A.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2009 ZAGHI, KERMAT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ, JORGE A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0207

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAGHI KERMAT

Defendant

LOPEZ JORGE A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLEN R. KING - ALLEN R. KING

Attorney at ALLEN R. KING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/25/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # 490068038 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT,UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. SERVED AS TO (LOPEZ, JORGE A.) . COSTS OF $ 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (LOPEZ, JORGE A.) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LOPEZ, JORGE A.) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (LOPEZ, JORGE A.) ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUNT TO CCP 415.46 ON 03/27/09 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/27/09 , FOR (ZAGHI, KERMAT) , AGAINST (LOPEZ, JORGE A.) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1050 N. ORANGE GROVE #1, WEST HOLLYWOOD, CA 90046 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 27.57 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH490068017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less