This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 11:34:59 (UTC).

YI, CAI VS. LIU, XIAO LIAN

Case Summary

On 02/05/2008 YI, CAI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIU, XIAO LIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0411

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YI CAI

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

LIU XIAO LIAN

CAMPO ROGELIO ISRAEL

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - MICHAEL S. YU ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

HOSP, GILBERT, BERGSTEN & HOUGH - ROBERT T. BERGSTEN ESQ

Attorney at HOSP, GILBERT, BERGSTEN & HOUGH

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEE, BAZZO & NISHI, LLP - TED M LEE

Attorney at LEE, BAZZO & NISHI, LLP

HOSP, GILBERT, BERGSTEN & HOUGH - ROBERT T. BERGSTEN ESQ

Attorney at HOSP, GILBERT, BERGSTEN & HOUGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/08/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • DocketORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (BETWEEN XIAO LIAN LIU AND ROGELIO ISRAEL OCAMPO) SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (LIU, XIAO LIAN) (CROSS-DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION ORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ML .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF PETER T. SATO, ESQ. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/06/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2008
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (CAMPO, ROGELIO ISRAEL) . CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT (CAMPO, ROGELIO ISRAEL) . CROSS-DEFENDANT (LIU, XIAO LIAN) . RECEIPT # ELM235338022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (CAMPO, ROGELIO ISRAEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, RESPONSIVE PLEADING HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE REMAINS ON CALENDAR FOR A NON-APPERANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ON 08/12/08 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED. SERVED AS TO (OCAMPO, ROGELIO ISRAEL) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2008
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM235338048.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/12/08 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YU MICHAEL S