This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 12:27:05 (UTC).

YADEGAR, POUYA VS. IVRIANI, ISAAC

Case Summary

On 06/04/2008 YADEGAR, POUYA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IVRIANI, ISAAC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN T. RAFFERTY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0986

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN T. RAFFERTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YADEGAR POUYA

Defendants

EBRIANA DANIELA

IVRIANI ORLI

IVRIANI ISAAC

GHAFFARI MINOO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/06/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 35.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW538978007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED TIMELY BY PLAINTIFF. 4TH REQUEST. FOWARDED TO BENCH OFFICE FOR APPROVAL. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 03/27/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED TIMELY. NO SELF ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE PROVIDED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/06/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED , 3RD REQUEST (SELF ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED #1 NO S.A.S.E. PROVIDED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (IVRIANI, ORLI) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (IVRIANI, ISAAC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (GHAFFARI, MINOO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (EBRIANA, DANIELA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (IVRIANI, ISAAC) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (GHAFFARI, MINOO) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (IVRIANI, ORLI) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (EBRIANA, DANIELA) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 07/25/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.