This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2016 at 06:45:35 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II VS. PHAM, LAM T

Case Summary

On 06/27/2008 WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PHAM, LAM T. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2184

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

Defendant

PHAM LAM T AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANG, RICHERT & PATCH - MATTHEW W. QUALL ESQ

Attorney at LANG, RICHERT & PATCH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/20/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II, LLC) FOR REJECTION OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT- PLEASE SUBMIT A NEW REQUEST FORM W/THE RETURNED FORMS AND A COPY OF THE ASSIGNMENT/BILL OF SALE FROM ASPIRE VISA TO THE PLAINTIFF. DEFAULT & DISMISSAL AS TO DOES ENTERED. SUBMITTED ON 12/22/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2008
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (PHAM, LAM T) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2008
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 1-2-09 IS HEREBY VACATED, MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 06/24/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT,DECLARATION,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM,NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT,ADR PKG FILED. SERVED AS TO (PHAM, LAM T) AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II, LLC) FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS -DEFENDANT'S NAME MUST MATCH THE COMPLAINT WORD FOR WORD, LETTER FOR LETTER. PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT SUBMITTED ON 07/24/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM236112020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/02/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUALL MATTHEW WARREN