This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 10:03:46 (UTC).

WOOD, GERALDINE VS. FU FAMILY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/16/2008 WOOD, GERALDINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FU FAMILY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT ARONOFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0083

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT ARONOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOOD GERALDINE

Defendant

FU FAMILY CORPORATION AG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/12/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 090 , HON. ROBERT ARONOFF PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 0000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (FU FAMILY CORPORATION) AGENT: DAI- CHEN FU . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/16/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/16/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED #1 SASE PROVIDED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2008
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/27/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (WOOD, GERALDINE) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 090 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (WOOD, GERALDINE) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985{I}, CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES FILED AND MAILED TO (WOOD, GERALDINE) PER SECTION 6103.5(D)/68511.3(D) GC FOR THE TOTAL AMOUNT DUE OF $ 71.00 .(AMOUNT INCLUDES A $21.00 ADMINISTRATIVE CHARGE). CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED. CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAWPAID . HEARING SET FOR 02/27/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (WOOD, GERALDINE) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 090 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.