This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 10:26:37 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, JAEL VS. BROWN, YOLANDA

Case Summary

On 02/08/2008 WILLIAMS, JAEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROWN, YOLANDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD JAFFE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0291

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOWARD JAFFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS JAEL

Defendants

BROWN YOLANDA

DESCARTES FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/17/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 090 , HON. HOWARD JAFFE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (DESCARTES FINANCIAL CORPORATION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 0000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (DESCARTES FINANCIAL CORPORATION) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/11/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BROWN, YOLANDA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/11/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED #1 FROM COURT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/11/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (DESCARTES FINANCIAL CORPORATION) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID . 70063450000383794003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (BROWN, YOLANDA) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID . 70063450000383794010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES FILED AND MAILED TO (WILLIAMS, JAEL) PER SECTION 6103.5(D)/68511.3(D) GC FOR THE TOTAL AMOUNT DUE OF $ 41.00 .(AMOUNT INCLUDES A $21.00 ADMINISTRATIVE CHARGE). CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED. CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2008
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (WILLIAMS, JAEL) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985{I}, CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2008
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES FILED AND MAILED TO (WILLIAMS, JAEL) PER SECTION 6103.5(D)/68511.3(D) GC FOR THE TOTAL AMOUNT DUE OF $ 51.00 .(AMOUNT INCLUDES A $21.00 ADMINISTRATIVE CHARGE). CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED. CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAWPAID . HEARING SET FOR 04/23/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.