This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 14:03:17 (UTC).

WESTHILL MANAGEMENT VS. FEOMIN, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 05/14/2009 WESTHILL MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against FEOMIN, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0673

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTHILL MANAGEMENT

Defendant

FEOMIN ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ALLEN R. KING - ALLEN R. KING

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALLEN R. KING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/02/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 161.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/05/09 . FOR (WESTHILL MANAGEMENT) . AGAINST (FEOMIN, ELIZABETH) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 2425 E. SLAUSON AVENUE #204, HUNTINGTON PK, CA 90255 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 14.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. *FWD TO SHERIFF DEPT* . RECEIPT # HPK303183009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FEOMIN, ELIZABETH) . COSTS OF $ 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FEOMIN, ELIZABETH) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK542830030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/29/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less