This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:50:52 (UTC).

WEST COAST PROPERTY SPECIALIST VS. REYES, ART

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 WEST COAST PROPERTY SPECIALIST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REYES, ART. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0290

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST COAST PROPERTY SPECIALISTS INC

Defendants

REYES ART

REYES ISABEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP - CHRIS EVANS

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARK R. HADDON - MARK R. HADDON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK R. HADDON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/24/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • NOTICE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORRSP. DESK RE: MISC. WORK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:40P M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ANTHONY PETERS PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. . MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 06/19/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (REYES, ART) , (REYES, ISABEL) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM448028023.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less