This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 04:12:19 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK VS TELLEZ, CANDIDO

Case Summary

On 03/05/2010 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TELLEZ, CANDIDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA M. WHEATLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0745

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA M. WHEATLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

WELLS FARGO BANK N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

Defendant

TELLEZ CANDIDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUPPA, TRUCCHI & HENEIN, LLP - MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA

SAMTANI SHIV

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/5/2010: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

3/5/2010: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/5/2010: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons

3/5/2010: Summons - Summons

Notice of Case Assignment - Notice of Case Assignment

3/5/2010: Notice of Case Assignment - Notice of Case Assignment

Other - (name extension) - Declaration of Maria E. DE Orduna Re: Verification of Venue

3/5/2010: Other - (name extension) - Declaration of Maria E. DE Orduna Re: Verification of Venue

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Not Found

3/22/2010: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Not Found

Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TELLEZ, CANDIDO) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

4/1/2010: Proof of Service (Legacy) - Proof of Service (Legacy) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TELLEZ, CANDIDO) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: DECLARATION OF MARIA E. DE ORDUNA RE PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY COSTS (CCP 1033)

5/17/2010: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: DECLARATION OF MARIA E. DE ORDUNA RE PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY COSTS (CCP 1033)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: DECLARATION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF' REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT (DDP 585D

5/17/2010: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: DECLARATION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF' REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT (DDP 585D

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/17/2010: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

5/17/2010: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/21/2010: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Other - (name extension) - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/7/2010: Other - (name extension) - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Accrued Interest

1/3/2012: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution Wholly Unsatisfied

9/18/2012: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution Wholly Unsatisfied

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/24/2014: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/20/2017: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: CANDIDO TELLEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: CANDIDO TELLEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment renewed for Plaintiff (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) against Defendant (TELLEZ, CANDIDO) on the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK on 03/05/2010 for the judgment amount of $5,087.36, post judgment credits of $1,276.40, and fee for filing renewal of $45.00 for a total of $3,855.96.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: CANDIDO TELLEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: CANDIDO TELLEZ (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 1276.40; Service Date: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF WAIVER POST JUDGMENT INTEREST AND COSTS; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for and Renewal of Judgment; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: CANDIDO TELLEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Robert Schuit; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TELLEZ, CANDIDO) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • DocketSERVICE RE: SUMMONS ASND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (TELLEZ, CANDIDO) FILED. COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketDeclaration of Maria E. DE Orduna Re: Verification of Venue; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (WELLS FARGO BANK) N. A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY DIANA M. WHEATLEY TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/08/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. WED . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WED OF HONORABLE DIANA M. WHEATLEY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY DIANA M. WHEATLEY TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/08/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. WED . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN SM507623008. Filing Fee: 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMIANI SHIV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUPPA, TRUCCHI & HENEIN, LLP - MARIA ESTELA DE ORDUNA ESQ